MI HB4649 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 524'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 524'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; foster parents; resource families bill of rights; create. Amends sec. 3 of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.953) & adds sec. 8a.
Title
Human services; foster parents; resource families bill of rights; create. Amends sec. 3 of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.953) & adds sec. 8a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 761 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 834 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 834 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 524'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:41 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:00 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/2/2015 @ 1:54 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 761 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 834 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Request Granted |
2014-12-17 | House | Senate Requests Return |
2014-12-17 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2014-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/01/2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-04-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |