MI HB4633 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 102'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 102'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; reports; uniform crime reporting system; include the national missing and unidentified persons system (NamUs) for reports of missing individuals. Amends sec. 8 of 1968 PA 319 (MCL 28.258).
Title
Law enforcement; reports; uniform crime reporting system; include the national missing and unidentified persons system (NamUs) for reports of missing individuals. Amends sec. 8 of 1968 PA 319 (MCL 28.258).
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned Pa 102'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/5/2018 @ 2:50 Pm |
2018-04-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 11:54 Am |
2018-04-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:50 Pm |
2018-03-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |