MI HB4627 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: family division; use of risk and needs assessment for juveniles in the juvenile justice system before disposition; require. Amends sec. 18, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4624'23
Title
Courts: family division; use of risk and needs assessment for juveniles in the juvenile justice system before disposition; require. Amends sec. 18, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4624'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou |
Same As/Similar To
HB4624 (Same As) 2023-09-26 - Referred To Second Reading