MI HB4617 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Printed Bill Filed 05/20/2015
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Printed Bill Filed 05/20/2015
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; landfills; mining, including reclamation activities, in landfills; prohibit. Amends sec. 11518 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11518).
Title
Environmental protection; landfills; mining, including reclamation activities, in landfills; prohibit. Amends sec. 11518 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11518).
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Faris [D] | Rep. John Chirkun [D] | Rep. Christine Greig [D] | Sen. Samir Singh [D] |
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Rep. Jon Hoadley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/20/2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2015-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Pam Faris |
Same As/Similar To
SB0348 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-4617 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-4617.htm |