MI HB4574 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 80'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 80'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; mortuary science; assignment or assumption of prepaid funeral contracts by purchaser of a licensed funeral establishment; require. Amends sec. 1806 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1806).
Title
Occupations; mortuary science; assignment or assumption of prepaid funeral contracts by purchaser of a licensed funeral establishment; require. Amends sec. 1806 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1806).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 255 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 255 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 255 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Assigned Pa 80'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2013 @ 3:57 Pm |
2013-07-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2013 @ 3:30 Pm |
2013-07-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/26/2013 @ 10:52 Am |
2013-06-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-20 | House | Roll Call # 255 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2013-06-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-06-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-06-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-05-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2013-05-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2013-04-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-04-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals, other
Cemeteries and funerals, prepaid contracts
Occupations, mortuary science
Cemeteries and funerals, prepaid contracts
Occupations, mortuary science