MI HB4550 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Re-referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Re-referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; penalties; penalty for crime of fourth degree vulnerable adult abuse; revise. Amends sec. 145n of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145n).
Title
Crimes; penalties; penalty for crime of fourth degree vulnerable adult abuse; revise. Amends sec. 145n of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145n).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-12-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-05-07 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/06/2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Derek Miller |
Subjects
Crimes: abuse
Crimes: penalties
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Disabilities: other
Senior citizens: crimes
Crimes: penalties
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Disabilities: other
Senior citizens: crimes