MI HB4550 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; credit; brownfield redevelopment credits; require to comply with corporate responsibility act in order to receive credit provision. Amends sec. 437 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1437).
Title
Michigan business tax; credit; brownfield redevelopment credits; require to comply with corporate responsibility act in order to receive credit provision. Amends sec. 437 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1437).
Sponsors
Rep. Gabe Leland [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 Yeas 108 Nays 1 | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Committee On Oversight And Investigations | |
2010-03-18 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-03-18 | Rule Suspended | |
2009-03-11 | Printed Bill Filed 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Commerce | |
2009-03-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced By Representative Gabe Leland |
Subjects
Economic development, brownfield redevelopment authority
Economic development, other
Michigan business tax, credit
Economic development, other
Michigan business tax, credit