MI HB4547 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Family law: marriage and divorce; marriage license fee; increase and earmark. Amends sec. 3 of 1887 PA 128 (MCL 551.103).
Title
Family law: marriage and divorce; marriage license fee; increase and earmark. Amends sec. 3 of 1887 PA 128 (MCL 551.103).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2023 |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors |
2023-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |
Subjects
Counties: financing
Family law: marriage and divorce
Health occupations: marriage and family therapists
Records: marriage
Family law: marriage and divorce
Health occupations: marriage and family therapists
Records: marriage