MI HB4537 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-25 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-25 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; disorderly conduct; penalties for disrupting a religious service; increase. Amends sec. 169 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.169).
Title
Crimes; disorderly conduct; penalties for disrupting a religious service; increase. Amends sec. 169 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.169).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-08-25 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 | |
2009-03-11 | Printed Bill Filed 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced By Representative Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
SB0351 (Same As) 2009-03-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-4537 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-4537.htm |