MI HB4533 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: scheduling; reference to August primary election in the revised judicature act of 1961; revise to June primary election. Amends secs. 550, 550a, 805, 8175 & 8176 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.550 et seq.).
Title
Elections: scheduling; reference to August primary election in the revised judicature act of 1961; revise to June primary election. Amends secs. 550, 550a, 805, 8175 & 8176 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.550 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 Yeas 65 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/17/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri |