MI HB4521 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-21 - Assigned Pa 146'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-21 - Assigned Pa 146'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; other; identification for service animals; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4527'15, SB 0298'15, SB 0299'15
Title
Animals; other; identification for service animals; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4527'15, SB 0298'15, SB 0299'15
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] | Rep. David Rutledge [D] | Rep. James Tedder [R] |
Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Rep. Jason Sheppard [R] | Rep. Bill LaVoy [D] | Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] |
Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Rep. Pam Faris [D] | Rep. Alberta Talabi [D] |
Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. Triston Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 335 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | House | Assigned Pa 146'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/20/2015 @ 4:36 Pm |
2015-10-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/20/2015 @ 3:44 Pm |
2015-10-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/15/2015 @ 12:03 Pm |
2015-10-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-10-07 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-10-07 | House | Roll Call # 335 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2015-10-07 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-10-06 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-10-06 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2015-06-16 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-16 | House | Title Amended |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-06-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-04-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |