MI HB4497 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; aerial spraying of pesticides to prevent and control diseases and environmental health hazards; require department of health and human services to provide notice to the public before implementation. Amends sec. 2221 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2221).
Title
Health: other; aerial spraying of pesticides to prevent and control diseases and environmental health hazards; require department of health and human services to provide notice to the public before implementation. Amends sec. 2221 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2221).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 82 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-05-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/11/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Brad Paquette |