MI HB4493 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; school employees; expand to include all persons employed in public or nonpublic schools and include in references to "clergy" any individual who holds himself or herself out as a member of the clergy. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.623).
Title
Children; protection; school employees; expand to include all persons employed in public or nonpublic schools and include in references to "clergy" any individual who holds himself or herself out as a member of the clergy. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 & 722.623).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-02-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-02-04 | House | Title Amended |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-01-30 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Substitute H-4 Not Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2013-04-09 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/21/2013 |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Subjects
Children, abuse or neglect
Children, protection
Education, employees
Human services, children's services
State agencies (existing), human services
Children, protection
Education, employees
Human services, children's services
State agencies (existing), human services