MI HB4475 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 240'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 240'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; land acquisition; cap on acreage in northern Michigan; remove, approve strategic plan, and restrict certain land acquisitions if FILT payments not made or state or federal land constitutes 40% or more of land in county. Amends heading of subpt. 1 of pt. 21 & amends secs. 301, 503, 2106, 2133 & 72118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.301 et seq.) & adds subpt. 17 to pt. 21. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0302'17, SB 0303'17
Title
Natural resources; land acquisition; cap on acreage in northern Michigan; remove, approve strategic plan, and restrict certain land acquisitions if FILT payments not made or state or federal land constitutes 40% or more of land in county. Amends heading of subpt. 1 of pt. 21 & amends secs. 301, 503, 2106, 2133 & 72118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.301 et seq.) & adds subpt. 17 to pt. 21. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0302'17, SB 0303'17
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 240'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2018 @ 3:02 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2018 @ 2:41 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:02 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-23 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 372 Yeas 67 Nays 42 |
2018-05-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |
Subjects
Natural resources: land acquisition
Natural resources: other
Natural resources: wildlife
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources
Natural resources: other
Natural resources: wildlife
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources