MI HB4471 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent
Pending: House Workforce, Trades, And Talent Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Labor: fair employment practices; certain vaccinations as a condition of employment; prohibit. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor: fair employment practices; certain vaccinations as a condition of employment; prohibit. Creates new act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseReferred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent
2021-03-10HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021
2021-03-09HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2021-03-09HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Sue Allor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback