MI HB4457 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Assigned Pa 106'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Assigned Pa 106'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; adoption registry fee; eliminate. Amends sec. 8 of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.958).
Title
Children; adoption; adoption registry fee; eliminate. Amends sec. 8 of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.958).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Assigned Pa 106'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-07-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/30/2015 @ 1:40 Pm |
2015-07-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/30/2015 @ 9:11 Am |
2015-07-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2015 @ 2:38 Pm |
2015-06-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2015-05-07 | House | Transmitted |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-04-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2015-04-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |