MI HB4430 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 71'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights; privacy; state assistance of federal government data collection; restrict. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights; privacy; state assistance of federal government data collection; restrict. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 117 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 117 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseAssigned Pa 71'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-03-20HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:12 Pm
2018-03-20HouseApproved By The Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:49 Am
2018-03-13HousePresented To The Governor 3/8/2018 @ 2:24 Pm
2018-03-01HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-01House Roll Call # 117 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2018-03-01HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-02-28HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-02-28HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2018-02-28SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 117 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-02-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-02-27SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-02-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-02-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-02-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-22SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-01-23SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-01-17HouseTransmitted
2018-01-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-01-17HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-11HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-01-11HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-03-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/28/2017
2017-03-28HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-03-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Martin Howrylak

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4430
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4430.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4430.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4430.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4430.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-05-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-17-004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-22-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-01-023.htm

Bill Comments

feedback