MI HB4418 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Weapons; firearms; natural resources and environmental protection act; update references. Amends sec. 43510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43510). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4416'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; firearms; natural resources and environmental protection act; update references. Amends sec. 43510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43510). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4416'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 185 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2017-06-07HouseTransmitted
2017-06-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 185 Yeas 59 Nays 49
2017-06-07HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-06HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-06-06HouseRead A Second Time
2017-05-30HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-05-30HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-03-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/28/2017
2017-03-28HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-03-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Sue Allor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback