MI HB4410 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 143'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Probate; wills and estates; exempt property; allow decedent to exclude adult child by written instrument. Amends sec. 2404 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.2404).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate; wills and estates; exempt property; allow decedent to exclude adult child by written instrument. Amends sec. 2404 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.2404).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAssigned Pa 143'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 11:00 Am
2018-05-10HouseApproved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:46 Pm
2018-05-02HousePresented To The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 10:00 Am
2018-04-26HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-04-26HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-04-26HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-04-26SenateInserted Full Title
2018-04-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-04-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-04-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-04-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-04-18SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-02-15SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-02-14HouseTransmitted
2018-02-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 Yeas 101 Nays 8
2018-02-14HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-02-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-03-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2017
2017-03-23HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-03-23HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4410
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0143.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-03-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-14-016.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-18-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-26-041.htm

Bill Comments

feedback