MI HB4395 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 263'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 263'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: traffic regulation; requirement of audible signal when being overtaken and passed by another vehicle on the right; eliminate. Amends sec. 636 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.636).
Title
Traffic control: traffic regulation; requirement of audible signal when being overtaken and passed by another vehicle on the right; eliminate. Amends sec. 636 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.636).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 558 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 263'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 12:58 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:08 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:51 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 558 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |