MI HB4391 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Assigned Pa 143'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Labor: health and safety; firefighting foam concentrate containing PFAS; require promulgation of rules regarding firefighters' use of. Amends sec. 14 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1014) & adds sec. 14r.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor: health and safety; firefighting foam concentrate containing PFAS; require promulgation of rules regarding firefighters' use of. Amends sec. 14 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1014) & adds sec. 14r.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 306 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-06HouseAssigned Pa 143'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-08-06HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/31/2020 03:34 Pm
2020-08-06HouseApproved By The Governor 07/31/2020 02:41 Pm
2020-07-23HousePresented To The Governor 07/23/2020 04:02 Pm
2020-07-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-07-21HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-07-21HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 306 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-07-21HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-07-21HouseRule Suspended
2020-07-21HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-07-21HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-06-25SenateInserted Full Title
2020-06-25SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-06-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-24SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-06-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-30SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-08SenateReferred To Committee On Environmental Quality
2019-10-03HouseTransmitted
2019-10-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-10-03HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-02HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2019-10-02HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2019-06-11HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-03-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2019
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2019-03-19HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4391
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4391.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4391.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4391.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0143.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-02-092.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-03-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-30-103.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-25-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-07-21-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback