MI HB4366 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; prescribers to prescribe and pharmacists to dispense opioid antagonists to public libraries; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 17744b of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4367'19
Title
Health: other; prescribers to prescribe and pharmacists to dispense opioid antagonists to public libraries; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 17744b of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4367'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |