MI HB4361 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Assigned Pa 38'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Assigned Pa 38'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; rate; general revisions and implementation of a corporate income tax; provide for. Amends title & secs. 2, 4, 6, 24, 26, 30, 30f, 36, 51, 52, 91, 102, 103, 105, 110, 115, 132, 195, 201, 251, 255, 256, 265, 266, 270, 271, 272, 278, 301, 311, 315, 322, 325, 402, 408, 451, 455, 471, 475, 508, 510, 512, 514, 520, 522, 526, 527a, 530 & 532 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.2 et seq.); designates secs. 1 to 532 as pt. 1; adds pts. 2 & 3 & repeals (See bill).
Title
Income tax; rate; general revisions and implementation of a corporate income tax; provide for. Amends title & secs. 2, 4, 6, 24, 26, 30, 30f, 36, 51, 52, 91, 102, 103, 105, 110, 115, 132, 195, 201, 251, 255, 256, 265, 266, 270, 271, 272, 278, 301, 311, 315, 322, 325, 402, 408, 451, 455, 471, 475, 508, 510, 512, 514, 520, 522, 526, 527a, 530 & 532 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.2 et seq.); designates secs. 1 to 532 as pt. 1; adds pts. 2 & 3 & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 88 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 88 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | House | Assigned Pa 38'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-05-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/25/2011 @ 2:46 Pm |
2011-05-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/25/2011 @ 12:44 Pm |
2011-05-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/17/2011 @ 10:58 Am |
2011-05-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-05-12 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-05-12 | House | Roll Call # 126 Yeas 56 Nays 52 |
2011-05-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2011-05-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-05-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-05-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Title Amended |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 Yeas 20 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Decision Of Chair Sustained |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 As Amended |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Substitute S-5 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 And Amendment(s) |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2011-04-28 | House | Transmitted |
2011-04-28 | House | Title Amended |
2011-04-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 88 Yeas 56 Nays 53 |
2011-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-04-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2011-04-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-04-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-03-02 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/02/2011 |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-03-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Jud Gilbert |
Subjects
Income tax, credit
Income tax, deductions
Income tax, exemptions
Income tax, income
Income tax, rate
Michigan business tax, replacement
Income tax, deductions
Income tax, exemptions
Income tax, income
Income tax, rate
Michigan business tax, replacement