MI HB4349 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 166'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 166'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of US-23 in Iosco County; designate as the "Peter C. Lemon Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2081) by adding sec. 42b.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of US-23 in Iosco County; designate as the "Peter C. Lemon Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2081) by adding sec. 42b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 166'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 01:00 Pm |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 12:18 Pm |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:17 Pm |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-10-08 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |