MI HB4344 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; motor vehicle service and repair act; make general revisions. Amends secs. 2, 2a, 3, 7, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 30, 32, 33, 34a & 36 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302 et seq.); adds secs. 7a, 7b, 7c, 7d, 7e, 7f, 10a, 13a, 13b & 32a & repeals sec. 39 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1339).
Title
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; motor vehicle service and repair act; make general revisions. Amends secs. 2, 2a, 3, 7, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 30, 32, 33, 34a & 36 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302 et seq.); adds secs. 7a, 7b, 7c, 7d, 7e, 7f, 10a, 13a, 13b & 32a & repeals sec. 39 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1339).
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Harvey Santana [D] | Rep. Wendell Byrd [D] | Rep. Rose Mary Robinson [D] |
Rep. Eric Leutheuser [R] | Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 358 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 334 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 (Y: 84 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 334 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 (Y: 84 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2016-09-07 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-07 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/6/2016 @ 2:48 Pm |
2016-06-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-01 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-4 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 358 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-4 |
2016-05-31 | House | Retransmitted |
2016-05-31 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-05-31 | House | Roll Call # 334 Yeas 86 Nays 23 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In As Amended |
2016-05-31 | House | Amended |
2016-05-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-05-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-02-10 | House | Transmitted |
2016-02-10 | House | Title Amended |
2016-02-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 Yeas 84 Nays 22 |
2016-02-10 | House | Amended |
2016-02-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2015-06-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2015-03-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/13/2015 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |