MI HB4344 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-03 - Assigned Pa 170'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-03 - Assigned Pa 170'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; population threshold for purpose of defining fire arson investigator as a police officer under the commission on law enforcement standards act; revise to not less than 600,000 and expand definition of certification. Amends sec. 2 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.602).
Title
Law enforcement; other; population threshold for purpose of defining fire arson investigator as a police officer under the commission on law enforcement standards act; revise to not less than 600,000 and expand definition of certification. Amends sec. 2 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.602).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) To Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 486 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In As Amended Roll Call # 348 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In As Amended Roll Call # 348 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-03 | House | Assigned Pa 170'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/18/2013 @ 1:15 Pm |
2013-12-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/18/2013 @ 9:50 Am |
2013-11-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/13/2013 @ 3:32 Pm |
2013-11-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-11-05 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-11-05 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 486 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-10-23 | House | Retransmitted |
2013-10-23 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-10-23 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In As Amended Roll Call # 348 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2013-10-23 | House | Amended |
2013-09-26 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-09-26 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2013-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Amended |
2013-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/01/2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2013-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Stallworth |