MI HB4321 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 82'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 82'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Assigned Pa 82'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/20/2018 @ 10:28 Am |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/20/2018 @ 9:52 Am |
2018-03-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/8/2018 @ 1:48 Pm |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | Roll Call # 126 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-01 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-03-01 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |