MI HB4321 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; search and seizure; warrant requirement to search a premises; provide for resident consent exception. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 25c to ch. IV.
Title
Criminal procedure; search and seizure; warrant requirement to search a premises; provide for resident consent exception. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 25c to ch. IV.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-28 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-28 | House | Title Amended |
2015-10-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 83 Nays 22 |
2015-10-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-22 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2015-10-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-03-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/12/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |