MI HB4313 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: associations; conversion of summer resort associations into nonprofit corporations; authorize. Amends 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.1 - 455.24) by adding sec. 19. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4312'23
Title
Businesses: associations; conversion of summer resort associations into nonprofit corporations; authorize. Amends 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.1 - 455.24) by adding sec. 19. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4312'23
Sponsors
Rep. Betsy Coffia [D] | Rep. Pat Outman [R] | Rep. Joseph Aragona [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Veronica Paiz [D] | Rep. John Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 (Y: 86 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmitted |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 Yeas 86 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-02-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/21/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2023-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Betsy Coffia |
Same As/Similar To
HB4312 (Same As) 2024-02-21 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Subjects
Businesses: associations
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs