MI HB4313 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; fiscal year 2017-2018 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; fiscal year 2017-2018 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 218 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 139 (Y: 0 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 203 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 87 (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 218 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 139 (Y: 0 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 203 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 87 (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | House | Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-09-06 | House | Assigned Pa 108'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/14/2017 @ 1:04 Pm |
2017-09-06 | House | Approved By The Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 7/14/2017 @ 11:07 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/10/2017 @ 1:54 Pm |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/29/2017 |
2017-07-12 | House | Conference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Retransmitted |
2017-06-20 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 218 Yeas 72 Nays 35 |
2017-06-20 | House | Conference Report Received |
2017-06-20 | House | Sen. Peter Macgregor Replaced Sen. Arlan Meekhof As Conferee 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Peter Macgregor Replaced Sen. Arlan Meekhof As Conferee 06/15/2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/31/2017: Sens. David Hildenbrand, Arlan Meekhof, Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2017-05-31 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/31/2017: Sens. David Hildenbrand Arlan Meekhof Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred To Conference Committee 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Conferees Named 05/30/2017: Reps. Tim Kelly Laura Cox Robert Kosowski |
2017-05-24 | House | Roll Call # 139 Yeas 0 Nays 107 |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-05-23 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Full Title |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 203 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-02 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-05-02 | House | Title Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Roll Call # 87 Yeas 60 Nays 47 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Kelly |
Subjects
Appropriations: community colleges
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: school aid
Appropriations: zero budget
Higher education: other
School aid: fiscal year appropriations
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: school aid
Appropriations: zero budget
Higher education: other
School aid: fiscal year appropriations