MI HB4311 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 152'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Gaming; other; lawful internet gaming act; create. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming; other; lawful internet gaming act; create. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 361 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 152'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:48 Am
2019-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:20 Am
2019-12-19HousePresented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:03 Pm
2019-12-11HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-12-11HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 361 Yeas 96 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseSenate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
2019-12-11HouseRule Suspended
2019-12-11HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-11HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect
2019-12-11SenateInserted Full Title
2019-12-11SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-12-11SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-11SenateRules Suspended
2019-12-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended
2019-12-11SenateSubstitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In
2019-12-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s)
2019-12-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-12-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-11-05SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-10-30HouseTransmitted
2019-10-30HouseTitle Amended
2019-10-30HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 Yeas 62 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-10-30HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-30HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2019-10-30HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5)
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-03-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2019
2019-03-07HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-03-07HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4311
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4311.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4311.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4311.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4311.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0152.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-19-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-29-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-30-103.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-11-115.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-11-114.htm

Bill Comments

feedback