MI HB4295 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 103'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 103'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: licenses; eligibility for medical marihuana license; modify. Amends sec. 402 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27402).
Title
Medical marihuana: licenses; eligibility for medical marihuana license; modify. Amends sec. 402 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27402).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 495 (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 103'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/04/2021 02:48 Pm |
2021-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/04/2021 09:40 Am |
2021-11-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/29/2021 11:16 Am |
2021-10-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-26 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 495 Yeas 97 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-10-26 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-10-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-10-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 Yeas 97 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-20 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-05-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |