MI HB4265 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 374'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 374'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; community colleges; annexation by community college district; revise criteria. Amends secs. 11, 21, 31, 34, 34a, 41, 51, 52, 54, 61, 82, 85 & 111 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.11 et seq.).
Title
Higher education; community colleges; annexation by community college district; revise criteria. Amends secs. 11, 21, 31, 34, 34a, 41, 51, 52, 54, 61, 82, 85 & 111 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.11 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Rep. Andy Schor [D] |
Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] | Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Philip Potvin [R] |
Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Sen. Winnie Brinks [D] | Rep. Pam Faris [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 630 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 727 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 727 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 374'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2016 @ 3:34 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 8:04 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 10:52 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 630 Yeas 100 Nays 8 |
2016-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-08 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-08 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 727 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-05-14 | House | Transmitted |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2015-05-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/27/2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |