MI HB4261 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-13)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of US-24 in Wayne County; designate as the "Julie Plawecki Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 92 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1092) & adds sec. 92a.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of US-24 in Wayne County; designate as the "Julie Plawecki Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 92 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1092) & adds sec. 92a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-09-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 102 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Jewell Jones |