MI HB4251 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Tobacco: other; vapor products or alternative nicotine products that contain vitamin E acetate; prohibit sale. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4878'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco: other; vapor products or alternative nicotine products that contain vitamin E acetate; prohibit sale. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4878'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-06-03HouseTransmitted
2021-06-03HouseTitle Amended
2021-06-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 108 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-06-03HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-02HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2021-06-02HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-20HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
2021-03-25HouseReferred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness
2021-03-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-23HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-02-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2021
2021-02-16HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-02-16HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Joe Bellino

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4251
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4251.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4251.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4251-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4251-0N298.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-F0E0A30D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-41A45700.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-3F0C5727.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-B69A2093.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-24B0FFC0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-3C3BD917.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-6341C419.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-94BBD60F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4249-9D8FD748.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-23-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-20-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-03-052.htm

Bill Comments

feedback