MI HB4226 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 130'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; mortgages; fee assessed by foreclosure sale purchasers to calculate redemption amount; provide cap. Amends sec. 3240 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3240).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; mortgages; fee assessed by foreclosure sale purchasers to calculate redemption amount; provide cap. Amends sec. 3240 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3240).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03HouseAssigned Pa 130'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-03HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/21/2019 04:16 Pm
2019-12-03HouseApproved By The Governor 11/21/2019 10:45 Am
2019-12-03HousePresented To The Governor 11/20/2019 09:07 Am
2019-11-07HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-11-07HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-11-07HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-11-07SenateInserted Full Title
2019-11-07SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-11-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-10-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-24SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-24SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-04-11SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
2019-04-10HouseTransmitted
2019-04-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-04-10HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-09HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-04-09HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-21HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-21HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-03-13HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-02-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2019
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Committee On Financial Services
2019-02-21HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Ryan Berman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4226
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0130.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-21-030.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-10-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-24-101.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-11-07-107.htm

Bill Comments

feedback