MI HB4223 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: judges; procedure for certain circuit court judges to sit as judges of the court of claims; establish. Amends secs. 6410 & 6413 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6410 & 600.6413). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4222'21
Title
Courts: judges; procedure for certain circuit court judges to sit as judges of the court of claims; establish. Amends secs. 6410 & 6413 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6410 & 600.6413). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4222'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-24 | House | Rep. Helena Scott Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 83 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/11/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |