MI HB4188 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Assigned Pa 53'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Children; adoption; objection to placements by child placing agency based on religious or moral convictions; allow. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding secs. 14e & 14f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4189'15, HB 4190'15

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; adoption; objection to placements by child placing agency based on religious or moral convictions; allow. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding secs. 14e & 14f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4189'15, HB 4190'15

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 243 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11HouseAssigned Pa 53'15 With Immediate Effect
2015-06-11HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/11/2015 @ 1:00 Pm
2015-06-11HouseApproved By The Governor 6/11/2015 @ 11:47 Am
2015-06-11HousePresented To The Governor 6/10/2015 @ 7:03 Pm
2015-06-10HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2015-06-10House Roll Call # 243 Yeas 65 Nays 44
2015-06-10HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2015-06-10HouseRule Suspended
2015-06-10HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2015-06-10HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2015-06-10SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2015-06-10SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2015-06-10SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2015-06-10SenateRules Suspended
2015-06-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2015-06-10SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2015-06-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2015-04-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2015-04-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2015-04-28SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2015-03-19SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
2015-03-18HouseTransmitted
2015-03-18HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 65 Nays 44
2015-03-18HouseAmended
2015-03-18HouseRead A Third Time
2015-03-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2015-03-17HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2015-03-17HouseRead A Second Time
2015-03-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2015-03-04HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2015-02-17HousePrinted Bill Filed 02/13/2015
2015-02-12HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2015-02-12HouseRead A First Time
2015-02-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-4188
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-4188.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billengrossed/House/htm/2015-HEBH-4188.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billengrossed/House/htm/2015-HEBS-4188.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billenrolled/House/htm/2015-HNB-4188.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/publicact/htm/2015-PA-0053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/House/htm/2015-HJ-03-04-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/House/htm/2015-HJ-03-18-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/Senate/htm/2015-SJ-04-28-038.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/Senate/htm/2015-SJ-06-10-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/House/htm/2015-HJ-06-10-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback