MI HB4177 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; law enforcement information network (LEIN); promulgation of rules to effectuate expunction and destruction of all arrest record information from LEIN and other databases by C.J.I.S. under certain circumstances; require. Amends sec. 4 of 1974 PA 163 (MCL 28.214). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4176'15, HB 4178'15
Title
Law enforcement; law enforcement information network (LEIN); promulgation of rules to effectuate expunction and destruction of all arrest record information from LEIN and other databases by C.J.I.S. under certain circumstances; require. Amends sec. 4 of 1974 PA 163 (MCL 28.214). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4176'15, HB 4178'15
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Rep. Scott Dianda [D] | Rep. Sherry Gay-Dagnogo [D] | Rep. Marcia Hovey-Wright [D] |
Rep. Rose Mary Robinson [D] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Criminal Justice (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2015-09-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2015 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |
Subjects
Criminal procedure: pretrial procedure
Criminal procedure: records
Law enforcement: fingerprinting
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
Law enforcement: reports
Criminal procedure: records
Law enforcement: fingerprinting
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
Law enforcement: reports