MI HB4163 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance: advertising; address requirement on campaign material; remove. Amends sec. 47 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.247).
Title
Campaign finance: advertising; address requirement on campaign material; remove. Amends sec. 47 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.247).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 58 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2022-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 58 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/04/2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |