MI HB4129 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; hearing aid; continuing education for hearing aid dealers, salespersons, and trainees; require. Amends secs. 1305, 1307 & 1308 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1305 et seq.).
Title
Occupations; hearing aid; continuing education for hearing aid dealers, salespersons, and trainees; require. Amends secs. 1305, 1307 & 1308 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1305 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2009-05-26 | Transmitted | |
2009-05-26 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 256 Yeas 99 Nays 8 | |
2009-05-26 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-05-26 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-05-26 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-05-26 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-03-11 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-05 | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2009 | |
2009-02-04 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | |
2009-02-04 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-04 | Introduced By Representative Pam Byrnes |