MI HB4121 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 586'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; other; metropolitan district elections; provide for under the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 24a, 509q, 558, 659, 863 & 960 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.24a et seq.) & adds sec. 17 & ch. XVIIA. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4122'11

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; other; metropolitan district elections; provide for under the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 24a, 509q, 558, 659, 863 & 960 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.24a et seq.) & adds sec. 17 & ch. XVIIA. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4122'11

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 908 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1088 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 586'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 1/7/2013 @ 1:27 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 1/7/2013 @ 10:06 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:00 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-14HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2012-12-14HouseSenate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 908 Yeas 105 Nays 0
2012-12-14HouseRule Suspended
2012-12-14HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-14HouseReturned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2012-12-14SenateTitle Amended
2012-12-14SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1088 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-14SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-14SenateRules Suspended
2012-12-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
2012-12-14SenateAmendment(s) Concurred In
2012-12-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
2012-12-14SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2012-12-14SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2012-02-08SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government And Elections
2012-02-07HouseTransmitted
2012-02-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 Yeas 104 Nays 0
2012-02-07HouseRead A Third Time
2012-02-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-02-02HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2012-02-02HouseRead A Second Time
2012-01-31HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-01-31HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2011-01-25HousePrinted Bill Filed 01/21/2011
2011-01-20HouseReferred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections
2011-01-20HouseRead A First Time
2011-01-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Richard Hammel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4121
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2011-HEBH-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2011-HEBS-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2011-HNB-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0586.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-01-31-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-02-07-011.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-14-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback