MI HB4112 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Assigned Pa 102'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Assigned Pa 102'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal years 2012-2013 and 2013-2014. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal years 2012-2013 and 2013-2014. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Haveman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 262 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 262 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 211 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 262 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 211 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 102'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2013 @ 4:15 Pm |
2013-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/3/2013 @ 11:40 Am |
2013-07-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/2/2013 @ 9:38 Am |
2013-06-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-06-20 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2013-06-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2013-06-20 | House | Roll Call # 262 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2013-06-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-06-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-06-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 322 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-06 | House | Title Amended |
2013-06-06 | House | Passed Roll Call # 211 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2013-06-06 | House | Amended |
2013-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2013-06-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/30/2013 |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Haveman |