MI HB4101 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Assigned Pa 57'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Assigned Pa 57'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: speech-language pathologists; temporary licensing of speech-language pathologists; modify. Amends sec. 17609 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17609).
Title
Health occupations: speech-language pathologists; temporary licensing of speech-language pathologists; modify. Amends sec. 17609 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17609).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 193 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Assigned Pa 57'24 |
2024-06-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/06/2024 02:08 Pm |
2024-06-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/06/2024 12:08 Pm |
2024-06-04 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/03/2024 04:16 Pm |
2024-05-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-05-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-05-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 193 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2024-02-21 | House | Transmitted |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-02-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Curtis Vanderwall |
Subjects
Health occupations: speech-language pathologists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs