MI HB4090 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; ordinances; county sanctuary policy prohibition act; create. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; ordinances; county sanctuary policy prohibition act; create. Creates new act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
2019-01-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2019
2019-01-24HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2019-01-24HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Beau Lafave

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback