MI HB4055 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax: exemptions; industrial processing exemption; clarify. Amends sec. 4o of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94o). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4054'23
Title
Use tax: exemptions; industrial processing exemption; clarify. Amends sec. 4o of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94o). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4054'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 81 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-03-16 | House | Transmitted |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 Yeas 81 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2023-03-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/01/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-02-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Jamie Thompson |
Same As/Similar To
HB4054 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Assigned Pa 30'23 With Immediate Effect