MI HB4042 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; nurses; nurse licensure compact; enact. Amends sec. 17201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17201) & adds secs. 16190, 17225 & 17225a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; nurses; nurse licensure compact; enact. Amends sec. 17201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17201) & adds secs. 16190, 17225 & 17225a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 55 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2020-03-17SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2020-02-27SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2020-02-26HouseTransmitted
2020-02-26HouseTitle Amended
2020-02-26HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 Yeas 55 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-02-26HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-26HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-02-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-02-26HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-26HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-06-06HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-01-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/15/2019
2019-01-15HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-01-15HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Mary Whiteford

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback