MI HB4017 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-06 - Assigned Pa 235'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-06 - Assigned Pa 235'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; other; fair sampling process; require for inspections under NREPA. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 1505.
Title
Environmental protection; other; fair sampling process; require for inspections under NREPA. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 1505.
Sponsors
Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. Robert Genetski [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] |
Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Gregory MacMaster [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 682 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-06 | House | Assigned Pa 235'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/1/2011 @ 2:47 Pm |
2011-12-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/28/2011 @ 12:52 Pm |
2011-11-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/18/2011 @ 9:38 Am |
2011-11-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-11-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-11-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 682 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2011-06-16 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2011-06-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/14/2011 |
2011-01-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-01-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Agema |