MI HB4006 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; school; technical amendments to revised school code concerning school board elections; provide for. Amends secs. 4, 5 & 614 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.4 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4005'11
Title
Elections; school; technical amendments to revised school code concerning school board elections; provide for. Amends secs. 4, 5 & 614 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.4 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4005'11
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2011-08-24 | House | Transmitted |
2011-08-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 72 Nays 36 |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/14/2011 |
2011-01-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2011-01-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |