MI HB4002 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Pa 9'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Pa 9'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; forfeiture; certain procedures for forfeiture in controlled substance cases; amend. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4001'19, SB 0002'19
Title
Criminal procedure; forfeiture; certain procedures for forfeiture in controlled substance cases; amend. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4001'19, SB 0002'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 74 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned Pa 9'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/09/2019 01:20 Pm |
2019-05-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/09/2019 11:57 Am |
2019-05-07 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/06/2019 11:42 Am |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-04-25 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-04-25 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 74 Yeas 107 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-04-25 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-04-25 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title Amended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmitted |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 Yeas 107 Nays 3 Excused 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-01-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/09/2019 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |